TX HR2402 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Bill Beveridge of Galveston on being named an Unsung Hero by the Galveston County Daily News.
Title
Congratulating Bill Beveridge of Galveston on being named an Unsung Hero by the Galveston County Daily News.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Adopted | |
2009-05-28 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-25 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-21 | Filed |