TX HR2393 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Bob and Merle Holland of Fort Worth on the occasion of their 50th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Bob and Merle Holland of Fort Worth on the occasion of their 50th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-17 | House | Filed |