TX HR2379 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Democratic Party precinct chair Ineice Davis in House District 110 in Dallas County.
Title
Commending Democratic Party precinct chair Ineice Davis in House District 110 in Dallas County.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-16 | House | Filed |