TX HR229 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Maria Teresa Rios-Vera of Corpus Christi.
Title
In memory of Maria Teresa Rios-Vera of Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed |