TX HR229 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 5, 2013, as Port Aransas Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 5, 2013, as Port Aransas Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2013-02-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PORT ARANSAS DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates