TX HR2222 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Tricia Shay on her selection as the 2022-2023 Secondary Teacher of the Year by the Region 16 Education Service Center.
Title
Congratulating Tricia Shay on her selection as the 2022-2023 Secondary Teacher of the Year by the Region 16 Education Service Center.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-22 | House | Filed |