TX HR2189 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the creation of the Texas Historically Black Colleges and Universities Legislative Caucus.
Title
Recognizing the creation of the Texas Historically Black Colleges and Universities Legislative Caucus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HISTORICALLY BLACK COLLEGES & UNIVERSITIES LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary