TX HR2181 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the Jefferson Outreach for Older People in San Antonio on the occasion of National Older Americans Month.
Title
Recognizing the Jefferson Outreach for Older People in San Antonio on the occasion of National Older Americans Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-16 | House | Filed |