TX HR2167 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 2011 as National Foot Health Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing April 2011 as National Foot Health Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-30 | Adopted | |
2011-05-30 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-27 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-20 | Filed |
Subjects
FOOT HEALTH AWARENESS MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates