TX HR215 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Oil City Iron Works on being named the Small Employer of the Year by Workforce Solutions for North Central Texas.
Title
Congratulating Oil City Iron Works on being named the Small Employer of the Year by Workforce Solutions for North Central Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Harris [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - Adopted RV#45 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-08 | House | Record vote RV#45 |
2023-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-08 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed |