TX HR2117 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating John Daniel Bunch of Houston on attaining the rank of Eagle Scout.
Title
Congratulating John Daniel Bunch of Houston on attaining the rank of Eagle Scout.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-16 | House | Filed |