TX HR2107 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dajia Contreras on becoming the first female Golden Gloves state boxing champion from Corpus Christi.
Title
Congratulating Dajia Contreras on becoming the first female Golden Gloves state boxing champion from Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-23 | House | Filed |