TX HR2102 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Wolfbots robotics team from San Antonio on its success at the 2023 FIRST Lego League state championship.
Title
Congratulating the Wolfbots robotics team from San Antonio on its success at the 2023 FIRST Lego League state championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Filed |