TX HR209 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Jason Castro of Rockwall for his achievement as an American Idol finalist in 2008.
Title
Congratulating Jason Castro of Rockwall for his achievement as an American Idol finalist in 2008.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |