TX HR2067 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Brandi Spear of Dessau Elementary School on being named a 2019 Humanitarian of the Year by the Pflugerville Independent School District.
Title
Congratulating Brandi Spear of Dessau Elementary School on being named a 2019 Humanitarian of the Year by the Pflugerville Independent School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-22 | House | Filed |