TX HR2013 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Michael Holland on the occasion of his retirement as superintendent of the Magnolia Independent School District.
Title
Congratulating Michael Holland on the occasion of his retirement as superintendent of the Magnolia Independent School District.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Eissler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-19 | Adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-11 | Filed |