TX HR1988 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the city of Rockwall and welcoming residents from the city to the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing the city of Rockwall and welcoming residents from the city to the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-15 | House | Filed |