TX HR1961 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Ethan Caudillo for his service as a legislative assistant in the office of Representative Jim Murphy.
Title
Honoring Ethan Caudillo for his service as a legislative assistant in the office of Representative Jim Murphy.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-08 | House | Filed |