TX HR1939 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Rich Tillman on earning the Community Builder Award from St. John's Masonic Lodge.
Title
Congratulating Rich Tillman on earning the Community Builder Award from St. John's Masonic Lodge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-19 | Adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-08 | Filed |