TX HR1925 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the centennial of Kiwanis International and honoring the Kiwanis Club of Vernon for its service to the community.
Title
Commemorating the centennial of Kiwanis International and honoring the Kiwanis Club of Vernon for its service to the community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-07 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-07 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |