TX HR1925 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Edson Amaro of Edinburg for his inspiring attitude and resilience in the face of extraordinary challenges.
Title
Commending Edson Amaro of Edinburg for his inspiring attitude and resilience in the face of extraordinary challenges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-07 | House | Filed |