TX HR1899 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating students from the Prosper High School Eagle Production Group on their success at the 2017 UIL Young Filmmakers Festival.
Title
Congratulating students from the Prosper High School Eagle Production Group on their success at the 2017 UIL Young Filmmakers Festival.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-03 | House | Filed |