TX HR187 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 21st anniversary of Together We Stand Christian Church in Missouri City.
Title
Commemorating the 21st anniversary of Together We Stand Christian Church in Missouri City.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-08-02 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-02 | House | Filed |