TX HR1866 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Mateo Simpson on his selection as the 2019 Laredo Sector Border Patrol Youth of the Year.
Title
Congratulating Mateo Simpson on his selection as the 2019 Laredo Sector Border Patrol Youth of the Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-20 | House | Filed |