TX HR1866 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Eta Phi Beta Sorority, Inc., on the occasion of its 2009 Founders Day celebration.
Title
Honoring Eta Phi Beta Sorority, Inc., on the occasion of its 2009 Founders Day celebration.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-14 | Adopted | |
2009-05-14 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-06 | Filed |