TX HR1844 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Cord Fletcher of Henderson High School on winning the UIL state wrestling championship in the 215-pound weight class.
Title
Congratulating Cord Fletcher of Henderson High School on winning the UIL state wrestling championship in the 215-pound weight class.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-10 | Filed |