TX HR1841 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jasmine Chapa of Sarita on being named the winner of the Texas Conservation Awards Poster Contest by the Texas State Soil and Water Conservation Board.
Title
Congratulating Jasmine Chapa of Sarita on being named the winner of the Texas Conservation Awards Poster Contest by the Texas State Soil and Water Conservation Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-07 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-07 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-07 | House | Filed |