TX HR1835 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Officer Amir Abdul-Khaliq of the Austin Police Department.
Title
In memory of Officer Amir Abdul-Khaliq of the Austin Police Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-28 | House | Filed |