TX HR1810 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Analisa Anastasi of Dallas on her receipt of the Girl Scout Gold Award.
Title
Congratulating Analisa Anastasi of Dallas on her receipt of the Girl Scout Gold Award.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-09 | Filed |