TX HR1739 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Honorable James E. Barden on his retirement as Medina County judge.
Title
Congratulating the Honorable James E. Barden on his retirement as Medina County judge.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-07 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-07 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |