TX HR1728 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Ethan Wei-Ning Song for earning the title of valedictorian of the Class of 2019 at Wisdom High School in Houston.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Ethan Wei-Ning Song for earning the title of valedictorian of the Class of 2019 at Wisdom High School in Houston.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24HouseAdopted
2019-05-24HouseLaid before the House
2019-05-24HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2019-05-22HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2019-05-21HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2019-05-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback