TX HR1690 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Kay Hickey on being named the 2013 Citizen of the Year by the Muenster Jaycees.
Title
Congratulating Kay Hickey on being named the 2013 Citizen of the Year by the Muenster Jaycees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-24 | House | Filed |