TX HR1670 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the government of Turkey to uphold and safeguard religious and human rights of all its citizens without compromise, to grant the Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate international recognition, ecclesiastical succession, and the right to train clergy of all nationalities, and to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate and all religious and faith traditions.
Title
Urging the government of Turkey to uphold and safeguard religious and human rights of all its citizens without compromise, to grant the Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate international recognition, ecclesiastical succession, and the right to train clergy of all nationalities, and to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate and all religious and faith traditions.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Rep. Beverly Woolley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Adopted | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-02 | Filed |
Subjects
ECUMENICAL PATRIARCHATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Miscellaneous
TURKEY, REPUBLIC OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Miscellaneous
TURKEY, REPUBLIC OF