TX HR1599 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Alex Priakos for her service as executive director of Mesquite Social Services.
Title
Honoring Alex Priakos for her service as executive director of Mesquite Social Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-04 | Adopted | |
2009-05-04 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-27 | Filed |