TX HR1583 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Childress High School teacher Cliff Johnson and his students for their contributions to the Ramps Across Texas program.
Title
Congratulating Childress High School teacher Cliff Johnson and his students for their contributions to the Ramps Across Texas program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Filed |