TX HR1540 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Milan Narayan for his service as an intern in the office of State Representative Gene Wu.
Title
Commending Milan Narayan for his service as an intern in the office of State Representative Gene Wu.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Filed |