TX HR1534 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Vicente Sanchez for his service as chief of staff in the office of State Representative Hubert Vo during the 87th Legislative Session.
Title
Honoring Vicente Sanchez for his service as chief of staff in the office of State Representative Hubert Vo during the 87th Legislative Session.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Filed |