TX HR1527 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending volunteers from North Collin County Habitat for Humanity and Lowe's Home Improvement in Prosper for their work in repairing a local home damaged by a fire.
Title
Commending volunteers from North Collin County Habitat for Humanity and Lowe's Home Improvement in Prosper for their work in repairing a local home damaged by a fire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT
NORTH COLLIN COUNTY HABITAT FOR HUMANITY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
NORTH COLLIN COUNTY HABITAT FOR HUMANITY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary