TX HR1492 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Captain Richard Baum on his retirement from the Horseshoe Bay Police Department.
Title
Congratulating Captain Richard Baum on his retirement from the Horseshoe Bay Police Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-11 | House | Filed |