TX HR1488 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Abigail Melick for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative John Wray.
Title
Commending Abigail Melick for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative John Wray.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Filed |