TX HR1463 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Waxahachie High School girls' golf team on winning the district championship.
Title
Congratulating the Waxahachie High School girls' golf team on winning the district championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-12 | Adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-04-20 | Filed |