TX HR146 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating J. D. and Lorine Burnes of Lone Oak on their 70th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating J. D. and Lorine Burnes of Lone Oak on their 70th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-25 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed |