TX HR1445 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Paying tribute to the life of Detective Tommy L. Keen of the Harris County Sheriff's Department.
Title
Paying tribute to the life of Detective Tommy L. Keen of the Harris County Sheriff's Department.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Crabb [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-22 | Adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-20 | Filed |