TX HR141 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Honorable Ida Hernandez Brazell on her retirement from the Fifth Administrative Judicial Region.
Title
Congratulating the Honorable Ida Hernandez Brazell on her retirement from the Fifth Administrative Judicial Region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-08-01 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-07-27 | House | Filed |