TX HR141 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Austin Holloway, salutatorian of the Class of 2013 at Borger High School.
Title
Congratulating Austin Holloway, salutatorian of the Class of 2013 at Borger High School.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-06-19 | House | Filed |