TX HR1384 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Elisa Perez and Judge Pete Perez of Fort Worth on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Elisa Perez and Judge Pete Perez of Fort Worth on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Filed |