TX HR1350 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Wayne Oscar Stockseth of Corpus Christi.
Title
In memory of Wayne Oscar Stockseth of Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-17 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-05 | House | Filed |