TX HR1346 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Canton High School Agricultural Issues Forum team on reaching the state semifinals of the 2016 Texas FFA Agricultural Issues Forum.
Title
Congratulating the Canton High School Agricultural Issues Forum team on reaching the state semifinals of the 2016 Texas FFA Agricultural Issues Forum.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |