TX HR1324 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Megan Allgeier of San Angelo on earning the Girl Scout Gold Award.
Title
Congratulating Megan Allgeier of San Angelo on earning the Girl Scout Gold Award.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed |