TX HR1281 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating the Williamson County and Cities Health District on its selection for the Action Communities for Health, Innovation, and EnVironmental ChangE initiative of the National Association of Chronic Disease Directors.
Title
Congratulating the Williamson County and Cities Health District on its selection for the Action Communities for Health, Innovation, and EnVironmental ChangE initiative of the National Association of Chronic Disease Directors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-07 | Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-23 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |